- 2011/04/01 - 2015/03/31 北海道大学スラブ研究センター 共同研究員
- 2013/10/01 - 2014/03/31 The University of Tokyo Faculty of Law
- 2010/04/01 - 2012/03/31 北海道大学スラブ研究センター 共同利用・共同研究拠点運営委員会委員
- 2009/04/01 - 2011/03/31 Sophia University Dean of the Faculty of Foreign Studies
- 2007/04/01 - 2011/03/31 Slavic Research Center, Hokkaido University Visiting Reserch Fellow
- 2006/10/01 - 2007/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2006/04/01 - 2007/03/31 The University of Tokyo Lecturer
- 2005/04/01 - 2007/03/31 Slavic Research Center, Hokkaido University Visiting Reserch Fellow
- 2005/10/01 - 2006/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2004/10/01 - 2005/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2003/04/01 - 2005/03/31 Slavic Research Center, Hokkaido University Visiting Reserch Fellow
- 2003/10/01 - 2004/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2002/10/01 - 2003/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2001/04/01 - 2003/03/31 Slavic Research Center, Hokkaido University Visiting Reserch Fellow
- 2001/04/01 - 2001/09/30 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 2000/04/01 - 2000/09/30 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 1999/04/01 - 2000/03/31 Kyushu University Visiting Professor
- 1994/04/01 - 2000/03/31 Keio University Lecturer
- 1993/04/01 - 2000/03/31 Tokyo Metropolitan University Lecturer
- 1992/04/01 - 2000/03/31 Center for Russian Studies, The Japan Institute of International Affairs Senior Research Fellow
- 1986/04/01 - 1992/03/31 The National Institute for Defense Studies Assistant Professor
- 1990/03/31 - 1992/02/28 Embassy of Japan in the USSR Attache
- 1989/04/01 - 1990/03/31 Keio University Lecturer
- 1978/04/01 - 1983/03/31 Keio University Teaching Assistant
- Sophia University Faculty of Foreign Studies, Department of Russian Studies Professor
Show all